Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Now in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Filed |