Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Filed |