Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0836 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023