Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0846 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023