Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0848 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023