LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0856
Action History
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0856
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0856
Action History
Senate
05/05/2023
Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 718 (Ch. 2023-305)
Senate
03/24/2023
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
Senate
03/07/2023
Introduced
Senate
02/23/2023
Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
Senate
02/16/2023
Filed