Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0902 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023