Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 645 (Ch. 2023-147), CS/CS/SB 264 (Ch. 2023-33)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 645
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Transportation; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|