Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Filed |