Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0914 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023