Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0948 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023