Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Filed |