|
06/22/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-266
|
|
|
|
06/20/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Substituted for CS/HB 901
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|