Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 443 (Ch. 2023-102)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 443
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Education read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|