Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 269 (Ch. 2023-24)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 269
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|