Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1045 (Ch. 2023-286)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1045
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|