Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Filed |