Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Now in Environment and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Filed |