Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1189 (Ch. 2023-275)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 1189
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|