Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Now in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Filed |