Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1034 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 17, 2023