Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Filed |