Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Filed |