Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 411 (Ch. 2023-101) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Filed |