Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1082 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023