Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Filed |