Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023