Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Remaining references corrected to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Filed |