LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1134
Action History
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1134
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1134
Action History
Senate
05/05/2023
Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Senate
03/22/2023
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
Senate
03/07/2023
Introduced
Senate
03/02/2023
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules
Senate
02/23/2023
Filed