Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1146 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023