Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1154 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023