Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | CS by Agriculture read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Filed |