Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023