Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1184 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023