|
06/30/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|