Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 16, 2023