Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1207 (Ch. 2023-276)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted HB 1207
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|