Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 667 (Ch. 2023-148) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Filed |