Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Filed |