Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Filed |