Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 1157 (Passed) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Filed |