Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1242 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023