Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2023-197), CS/CS/CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2023-70)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1305
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 14 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|