Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1258 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023