Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1262 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023