|
05/18/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-93
|
|
|
|
05/17/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|