Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Filed |