Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 949 (Ch. 2023-67)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 949
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|