Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1300 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023