Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 761 (Ch. 2023-150)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 761
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Regulated Industries
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Regulated Industries; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|